EP0786237 - Dental post provided with support frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weissman, Bernard 225 East 48th Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101012.1 | 25.01.1996 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786237 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786237 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/30 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
A61C13/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Wurzelstift mit Trägerstruktur | [1997/31] | English: | Dental post provided with support frame | [1997/31] | French: | Tenon dentaire avec une structure de support | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.10.2002 | GB | 25.01.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2018330 (NIKOGHOSSIAN) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * [Y] 3; | [Y]DE3806891 (SCHEPPERHYN) [Y] 3 * fig 1, ref. signs 1,2 *; | [A]WO8601393 (JAKOB) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO7900275 (SPANG) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE9216158U (SCHMIDT TITO) [A] 11 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4604060 (WEISSMAN) [A] 11 * abstract * |