EP0725300 - A display device with a display member illuminator, an appliance provided with a display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINOLTA CO., LTD. Osaka Kokusai Building, 3-13, 2-Chome, Azuchi-Machi Chuo-Ku, Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states MINOLTA CO., LTD. Osaka Kokusai Building, 3-13, 2-Chome, Azuchi-Machi Chuo-Ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizumo, Yoshiyuki, c/o Minolta Co., Ltd. Osaka Kokusai Bldg, 3-13, 2-chome, Azuchi-machi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Makoto, c/o Minolta Co., Ltd. Osaka Kokusai Bldg, 3-13, 2-chome, Azuchi-machi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101340.6 | 31.01.1996 | [1996/32] | Priority number, date | JP19950014101 | 31.01.1995 Original published format: JP 1410195 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0725300 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0725300 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
G02B6/0056 (EP,US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
G02B6/0031 (EP,US);
G02B6/0036 (EP,US);
G02B6/0073 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/32] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung mit Beleuchtungseinrichtung und -gerät mit einer solchen Anzeigevorrichtung | [1996/32] | English: | A display device with a display member illuminator, an appliance provided with a display device | [1996/32] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage comprenant un élément d'éclairage, et appareil pourvu d'un tel dispositif d'affichage | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH0247630 ; | [X]JPH0675218 ; | [X]US4118110 (SAURER ERIC, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 59; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0399506 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0545705 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-10* column 10, line 14 - column 11, line 30; figure 6 * | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 214, Database accession no. (P - 1044), & JP02047630 A 00000000 (OLYMPUS) [XD] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 18, no. 321, Database accession no. (P - 1756), & JP06075218 A 00000000 (STANLEY) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS5652788U | JPS60150585U | JPH0247630 | JPH0253040 | JPH0440269U | JPH0625802U |