Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0726053
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.05.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] |
15.05.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] |
25.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
22.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
28.06.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] |