EP0730084 - Method and apparatus for controlling a tunneling advancing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG Postfach 81 02 80 81902 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG Postfach 810280, Erdinger Landstrasse 1 D-81902 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 20 80 76810 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Patentanwälte Möll und Bitterich Postfach 20 80 76810 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 96101555.9 | 03.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | DE1995107346 | 02.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19507346 | [1996/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730084 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730084 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E21D9/00 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
E21D9/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1996/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Steuern einer Vortriebsmaschine | [1996/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling a tunneling advancing machine | [1996/36] | French: | Apparail et dispositif pour la commande d'une machine à creusement | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 01.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/09] | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4017833 (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG) [A] 1,5; | [A]JPH03148003 ; | [A]JPH02112718 ; | [PA]DE4420705 (KELLER GRUNDBAU GMBH) [PA] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910924), vol. 015, no. 376, Database accession no. (P - 1255), & JP03148003 A 19910624 (KUMAGAI GUMI CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900718), vol. 014, no. 333, Database accession no. (P - 1078), & JP02112718 A 19900425 (TAISEI CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |