EP0728666 - Conveyor device with a circular path, particularly for groups of fragile cylindrical objects and for use in cigarette packing machines or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SASIB TOBACCO S.p.A. Via di Corticella 87/89 40128 Bologna / IT | [1998/20] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states SASIB S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87/89 I-40128 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spada, Valter Via Porrettana Nord 43 I-40043 Marzabotto, Bologna / IT | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Bruno, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Porsia, Bruno, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 96101718.3 | 07.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | IT1995GE00015 | 15.02.1995 Original published format: IT GE950015 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728666 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728666 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/26, B65B19/22, B65B65/04, B65G47/84 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
B65B35/26 (EP,US);
B65B19/223 (EP,US);
B65B65/04 (EP,US);
B65G47/846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/35] | Title | German: | Förderer mit kreisförmiger Bahn, insbesondere für Gruppen zerbrechlicher, zylindrischer Gegenstände in Zigaretten-Verpackungsmaschinen oder dergleichen | [1996/35] | English: | Conveyor device with a circular path, particularly for groups of fragile cylindrical objects and for use in cigarette packing machines or similar | [1996/35] | French: | Convoyeur avec parcours circulaire, spécialement pour groupes d'objets fragiles cylindriques et utilisé dans des machines d'emballage de cigarettes ou similaires | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2019803 (GD SPA) [Y] 5-7 * page 2, line 111 - page 3, line 43; figure 1 *[A] 8; | [XAY]US4352265 (HAENSEL OTTO, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 6; figure 3 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 5-7 | Examination | US3055490 |