EP0741289 - Test bench for tracked vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Falckensteiner Strasse 2 24159 Kiel / DE | [2001/12] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states MaK System Gesellschaft mbH Falckensteiner Strasse 2 D-24159 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Paul-Schröder-Strasse 12 D-24229 Dänischenhagen / DE | 02 /
Bruhn, Peter Hainbuchenweg 14 D-24536 Neumünster / DE | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102003.9 | 12.02.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | DE1995114173 | 15.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19514173 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0741289 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0741289 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741289 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/06, G01P3/56 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
G01M17/06 (EP);
G01P3/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/45] | G01M17/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/45] | Title | German: | Prüfstand für Kettenfahrzeuge | [1996/45] | English: | Test bench for tracked vehicles | [1996/45] | French: | Banc d'essai de véhicules à chenilles | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.10.2001 | GB | 31.10.2001 | IT | 31.10.2001 | CH | 28.02.2002 | LI | 28.02.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 31.10.2001 | |
GB | 31.10.2001 | ||
CH | 28.02.2002 | ||
LI | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | GB | 31.10.2001 | |
CH | 28.02.2002 | ||
LI | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 31.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3636267 (RENK AG) [Y] 1-4 * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]DE4216843 (RENK AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]WO8705574 (IFIELD ENG PTY [AU]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 9 *; | [A]US4895052 (GLEASMAN VERNON E [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,8,18,29 *; | [A]DE3636153 (RENK AG) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE2601113 (DEERE & CO) [A] 1 * page 8 - page 14 *; | [A]DE3932647 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2 *; | [A]US4699021 (WADDINGTON CLIVE [US]) [A] 1 * column 5 - column 8 * |