EP0728751 - Process for the manufacture of diltiazem [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION CORPORATION FERMION Koivu-Mankkaan tie 6A 02200 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states ORION CORPORATION FERMION Koivu-Mankkaan tie 6A FIN-02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hytönen, Martti Heisipuunkuja 2 A 1 02700 Espoo / FI | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102348.8 | 16.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | FI19950000719 | 17.02.1995 Original published format: FI 950719 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0728751 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0728751 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D281/10 | [1996/35] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/35] | Extension states | LT | 14.03.1996 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Diltiazem | [1996/35] | English: | Process for the manufacture of diltiazem | [1996/35] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de Diltiazem | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 11.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/24] | 21.01.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0098892 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * see page 4, line 3 and page 6, lines 4/5 *; column W *; | [X]EP0353032 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * see page 19, line 45 - 64 and page 17, step B4 *; column W *; | [DY]WO9210485 (LUSOCHIMICA SPA [IT]) [DY] 1-4 * column W *; | [DX]EP0594101 (PROFARMACO NOBEL SRL [IT]) [DX] 1-4 * see page 2, line 16 - 32 *; column W *; | [Y] - MIYATA,O. ET AL., "Stereoselective Addition of 2-Aminothiophenol ot alpha-Alkoxycinnamic Acid Derivatives --Alernative Synthesis of (+-)-Diltiazem--", TETRAHEDRON, OXFORD, (1993), vol. 49, no. 36, pages 8119 - 8128, XP002012059 [Y] 1-4 * see page 8123, scheme 6 *; column W * | [Y] - TANAKA,T. ET AL., "Synthesis of the Optically Active trans-Isomers of Diltiazem and Their Cardiovascular Effects and Ca-Antagonistic Activity", CHEM.PHARM.BULL., TOKYO, (1992), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 1476 - 1480, XP002012060 [Y] 1-4 * column W * |