EP0728637 - Emergency seatbelt releasing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer, Johann-Peter Backesstrasse 4 47669 Wachtendonk / DE | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/35] | Application number, filing date | 96102673.9 | 22.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | DE1995106277 | 23.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19506277 | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728637 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/00, B60R22/32 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
B60R22/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, NL [1996/49] |
Former [1996/35] | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Trennvorrichtung für Sicherheitsgurte | [1996/35] | English: | Emergency seatbelt releasing device | [1996/35] | French: | Dispositif de libération rapide d'une ceinture de sécurité | [1996/35] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1996 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FR, GB, IT | 17.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 01.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/46] | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.05.1996 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.1996 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.1996 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.1996 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.04.1997 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2507864 (FERRANDON GUY , CHEVALIER ALAIN PIERRE) [X] 1-3,10 * figures 1-6 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 9 * [A] 4,5,9; | [XA]FR2354221 (GUITARD LAURENT) [X] 1,2,5,9 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [XA]US4009905 (DESIRE JEAN-MARIE BEJEANNIN) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 1-6,11 * * claim 1 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 40 * [A] 4,5,9; | [XA]DE3220133 (JÄCKLE EGMONT , PILGRIM VOLKER) [X] 1,2,5 * figure - * * claim 1 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 19 * [A] 4; | [XA]GB1596307 (BRITAX (WINGARD) LIMITED) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 3,4,11 * * claims 1-5 * * page 3, line 18 - line 80 * * page 4, line 2 - line 16 * [A] 6,9; | [DXA]DE2926880 (DRUXEIS RUDOLF) [DX] 1,3 * figures 1-4 * * claim 1 * * page 12, line 1 - page 15, line 8 * [A] 2,4,5; | [XA]FR2382902 (FARCINADE MICHEL) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [A] 4,9; | [XA]DE3619650 (JÄHRLING HORST) [X] 1,3 * figure - * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 52 * [A] 2,4,5 |