EP0729147 - Disc player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI CORPORATION 4-12, Hirakawa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states ASAHI CORPORATION 4-12, Hirakawa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunoda, Norio 4-12, Hirakawa-cho, 2-chome Chiyoda-ku / JP | 02 /
Yano, Hideo 4-12, Hirakawa-cho, 2-chome Chiyoda-ku / JP | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Schickedanz, Willi Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Schickedanz, Willi, Dipl.-Ing. Langener Strasse 68 D-63073 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 96102717.4 | 23.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | JP19950037107 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: JP 3710795 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0729147 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0729147 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/00, G11B19/02, G11B19/20, G11B19/12, G11B7/085 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G11B19/20 (EP,US);
G11B19/00 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (EP,US);
G11B19/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/08535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/35] | Title | German: | Plattenspieler | [1996/35] | English: | Disc player | [1996/35] | French: | Lecteur de disque | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 29.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/39] | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.1999 | 29.02.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5172354 (OTSUBO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH01106363 ; | [A]JPH04205720 ; | [E]US5696744 (OKAMOTO NARUHIRO [JP], et al) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US4773052 (SUGIURA SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4724492 (KOSAKA MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]US5056075 (MARUTA KEIJI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890804), vol. 013, no. 347, Database accession no. (P - 910), & JP01106363 A 19890424 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921117), vol. 016, no. 547, Database accession no. (P - 1452), & JP04205720 A 19920727 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |