EP0730016 - Adhesive composition and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimoto, Hiroyuki 1-1-10-401, Kitano, Yasu-cho Yasu-gun, Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakatsuji, Yoshihiro 2-10-3-310, Sonehigashimachi Toyonaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Ohtani, Kohsuke 1-2-40, Hirata Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Igarashi, Toshio 59, Shimogamomiyazaki-cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 05 /
Funakoshi, Satoru 3-16-56-105, Toyosato, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103165.5 | 01.03.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | JP19950042800 | 02.03.1995 Original published format: JP 4280095 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730016 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730016 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09J127/06, C09J123/10, B32B27/30, B29C41/00 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09J127/06 (EP,KR);
B29C41/18 (EP);
B32B27/08 (KR,US);
B32B27/304 (KR,US);
B32B27/32 (KR,US);
B32B37/06 (KR);
B32B37/08 (KR);
B32B37/10 (KR);
B32B37/12 (KR);
C08L23/10 (EP,KR);
C08L23/16 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C09J123/16, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C09J127/06, C08L2666/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/36] | Title | German: | Klebstoffzusammensetzung und ihre Verwendung | [1996/36] | English: | Adhesive composition and use thereof | [1996/36] | French: | Composition adhésive et son utilisation | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.06.1999 | IT | 09.06.1999 | NL | 09.06.1999 | GB | 01.03.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 09.06.1999 | |
NL | 09.06.1999 | ||
GB | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 09.06.1999 | |
FR | 05.11.1999 | ||
GB | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | FR | 05.11.1999 | |
GB | 01.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/25] | FR | 05.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0508801 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * examples 9,10; claim - *; | JPH06106553 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | JPH06170871 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19941031), vol. 121, no. 18, Database accession no. 207447, XP002005214 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19941128), vol. 121, no. 22, Database accession no. 257705, XP002005215 [A] 1 * abstract * |