EP0730887 - Golf club sole configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACUSHNET COMPANY 333 Bridge Street Fairhaven Massachusetts 02719 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states ACUSHNET COMPANY 333 Bridge Street Fairhaven, Massachusetts 02719 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilbert, Peter J. 2730 Jefferson Street, No 22 Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | [1996/39] |
Former [1996/37] | 01 /
Gilbert, Peter J. 924 Heritage Lane Vista, CA 92083 / US | Representative(s) | Haug, Dietmar, et al Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Haug, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrae, Flach, Haug, Kneissl Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103493.1 | 06.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | US19950402251 | 10.03.1995 Original published format: US 402251 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730887 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730887 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63B53/04 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
A63B53/005 (EP,US);
A63B53/04 (EP,US);
A63B53/0408 (EP,US);
A63B53/0433 (EP,US);
A63B53/0458 (EP,US);
A63B53/047 (EP,US);
A63B60/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | Sohlenkonfiguration eines Golfschlägers | [1996/37] | English: | Golf club sole configuration | [1996/37] | French: | Configuration de semelle de club de golf | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.04.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5301944 (KOEHLER TERRY B [US]) [X] 1-4,8,9,12,13 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 30; figures 3,4 *; | [XA]WO9322006 (HAHN DE BYKHOVETZ NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 8,9,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 1-3; | [A]US3088736 (MOSPAN NICHOLAS R) [A] 1-3,5,8,9,11-13,15 * column 2, line 30 - line 69; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4854580 (KOBAYASHI KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-9,13 * column W *; | [A]US5154423 (ANTONIOUS ANTHONY J [US]) [A] 1,4,5,8-11,14,15 * column 4, line 31 - line 35; figures 10,11 *; | [A]US5326105 (FENTON JR FRANCIS A [US]) [A] 1,3,6-8,13 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0574334 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [A] 1,5,8,15 * figures 5-7,9-11 *; | [A]US5301941 (ALLEN DILLIS V [US]) |