EP0735174 - Latch needle for machines for making knitwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert Kommanditgesellschaft Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [1997/24] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states Theodor Groz & Söhne & Ernst Beckert Nadelfabrik Commandit-Gesellschaft Parkweg 2 D-72458 Albstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmoll, Wolfgang Waldstrasse 62 72401 Haigerloch-Owingen / DE | 02 /
Wissmann, Siegfried Unter der Heusteige 26 72459 Albstadt-Pfeffingen / DE | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103544.1 | 07.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | DE19951012375 | 01.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19512375 | [1996/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0735174 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0735174 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735174 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D04B35/04 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
D04B35/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/40] | Title | German: | Zungennadel für Maschinen zur Herstellung von Maschenware | [1996/40] | English: | Latch needle for machines for making knitwear | [1996/40] | French: | Aiguille à clapet pour des machines de fabrication de tricot | [2000/28] |
Former [1996/40] | Aguille à clapet pour des machines de fabrication de tricot | Examination procedure | 05.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4099391 (FUKUHARA MASAO); | [DA]DE2714607 (GROZ & SOEHNE THEODOR); | [A]GB2128209 (FUKUHARA NEEDLE CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 104 - page 2, line 11; figures 5-9 *; | [DA]DE4324232 (SIPRA PATENT BETEILIGUNG [DE]) |