Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3214284B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2001 | B2 | JPH08251761 | 27.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5152895 | 10.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0731533 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2002 | B1 | EP0731533 | 22.10.1997 | A3 | EP0731533 | 11.09.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP5152895 | 10.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1058814C | 22.11.2000 | C | CN1143847 | 26.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5152895 | 10.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69618490D1 | 21.02.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP5152895 | 10.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5868583 | 09.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP5152895 | 10.03.1995 |