EP0731533 - Electrical connection box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City Mie Pref. 513 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie Pref. 513 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naitou, Tsutomu, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City, Mie Pref. / JP | 02 /
Hayakawa, Tatsuya, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Syst., Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City, Mie Pref. / JP | [2001/34] |
Former [1996/37] | 01 /
Taitou, Tsutomu, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City, Mie Pref. / JP | ||
02 /
Hayakawa, Tatsuya, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Syst., Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City, Mie Pref. / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103587.0 | 07.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | JP19950051528 | 10.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5152895 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0731533 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0731533 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731533 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627, H01R13/506, H01R13/73, B60R16/02 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/73 (EP,US);
H01R13/6271 (EP,US);
H01R31/02 (EP,US);
Y10S439/949 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/37] | H01R13/627, H01R13/506, H01R13/73 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/37] | Title | German: | Elektrische Anschlussdose | [1996/37] | English: | Electrical connection box | [1996/37] | French: | Boîte de raccordement électrique | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.01.2002 | GB | 16.04.2002 | DE | 17.04.2002 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/30] | GB | 16.04.2002 | |
DE | 17.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 16.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4371743 (DECKER EARL L) [X] 1 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 49 * [A] 2-5; | [XA]DE9104428U (GROTE & HARTMANN GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1 * page 3, line 9 - page 8, line 11 * [A] 2-6; | [XA]US5195900 (KUMAGAI FUMIO [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 22 - column 8, line 55 * [A] 2-6; | [A]GB1210035 (MOLEX PRODUCTS CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 114 * |