EP0731492 - Method of growing a single crystal thin film with a uniform thickness, in the vapor phase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI COMPANY LIMITED 4-2, Marunouchi 1-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagoya, Takatoshi, c/o Isobe Kojo Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd., 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Kashino, Hisashi, c/o Isobe Kojo Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd., 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Habuka, Hitoshi, c/o Handotai Isobe Kenkyusho Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd., 13-1 Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103695.1 | 08.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | JP19950079453 | 10.03.1995 Original published format: JP 7945395 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0731492 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0731492 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/205, C30B25/14, C30B25/02, C30B25/16 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
C30B25/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/37] | H01L21/205, C30B25/02, C30B25/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufwachsen einer Einkristall-Dünnschicht mit konstanter Dicke in der Gasphase | [1996/37] | English: | Method of growing a single crystal thin film with a uniform thickness, in the vapor phase | [1996/37] | French: | Méthode de croissance en phase vapeur d'un film mince monocristallin, présentant une épaisseur uniforme | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 03.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/27] | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5108540 (FRIJLINK PETER M [FR]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 10 - line 18 * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 41; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 1 - line 16; figures 4A,4B * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 12; figure 6 * [A] 2 [Y] 3; | [A]JPS62235728 ; | [A]JPS61248518 ; | [XY] - YOSUKE INOUE ET AL., "RF induction heated hot-wall type reactor for high volume, low cost Si epitaxy", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, (199004), vol. 137, no. 4, pages 1228 - 1234, XP000242172 [X] 1,2 * page 1228, column R - page 1229, column L * * page 1231 - page 1234; figures 11-14 * [Y] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2086637 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 012, no. 106, Database accession no. (E - 596), & JP62235728 A 19871015 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870327), vol. 011, no. 099, Database accession no. (E - 493), & JP61248518 A 19861105 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - NAKAMURA S ET AL, THE UNIFORMITY CONTROL ON SILICON EPITAXIAL GROWTH USING A LAMINAR FLOW, EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, VOL. 92/2, PAGE(S) 622/623, (19920101), XP000549968 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |