EP0732300 - Mobile working apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Teupen Maschinenbaugesellschaft mbH Amelandsbrückenweg 85-87 D-48599 Gronau-Epe / DE | [1996/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Awater, Klaus Am Vechteltal 1 48465 Quendorf / DE | 02 /
Leusder, Hermann An den Quellen 2b 48607 Ochtrup / DE | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmeister, Helmut Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Hoffmeister, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Goldstrasse 36 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 96103767.8 | 11.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | DE1995109292 | 15.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19509292 | DE1995205173U | 27.03.1995 Original published format: DE 29505173 U | [1996/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732300 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732300 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732300 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66F11/04, B66C23/78 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
B66C23/80 (EP);
B66F11/046 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/38] | B66F11/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, GB, IE, IT [1996/38] | Title | German: | Mobiles Arbeitsgerät | [1996/38] | English: | Mobile working apparatus | [1996/38] | French: | Engin mobile de travail | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9014713U (NESWADBA PETER) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4397373 (REAM MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1718292U (INT BAUMASCHINENFABRIK A G [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3; figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP0223761 | DE8524989U | - TEUPEN-Prospekt "Working platform UL11" | - TEUPEN-Prospekt "Teleskoparbeitsbühne TL18/TL18h" |