EP0750935 - Process for cleaning process waste gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/38] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Miraustr. 54 13509 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholz, Guido, Dr. Alztalstrasse 26 84508 Burgkirchen / DE | 02 /
Dörpinghaus, Norbert, Dr. Bonnstrasse 186 50321 Brühl / DE | 03 /
Grosse, Jürgen, Dr. Blankenheimer Weg 33 50374 Erftstadt / DE | [1997/01] | Application number, filing date | 96103854.4 | 12.03.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | DE1995123493 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19523493 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750935 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750935 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/46, B01D53/72 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B01D53/72 (EP);
B01D53/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Prozessabgasen | [1997/01] | English: | Process for cleaning process waste gases | [1997/01] | French: | Procédé d'épuration de gaz effluents de procédés chimiques | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 10.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU567477 ; | [A]US2313022 (FRIEDRICH ROTTMAYR) [A] 1,4,9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9001365 (FABIAN WERNER [DE]) [A] 1,4-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2607587 (HOELTER HEINZ) [A] 1,12 * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0063829 (INTEROX SA [BE]) [A] 1,11,14 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 14; claims 1-11 *; | [A]DE2730947 (FMC CORP) [A] 1,12 * claims 1,2 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 24, Database accession no. 78-43584A, XP002014877 & SU567477 A 19770822 (NATURAL GAS TRANSP) [X] 1-3,11,12,14 * abstract * | [A] - REITHER K, "ABLUFTREINIGUNG BEI HALBLEITERPRODUKTIONEN", WASSER, LUFT UND BODEN, (19920701), vol. 36, no. 7 / 08, pages 58 - 60, XP000297820 [A] 1,4-10 |