EP0732759 - Module battery of sealed alkaline storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimakawa, Shinichi Shoto-ryo, 5-22-13 Touda-cho, Moriguchi City, 570 / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Shinji 2-20-1-307, Higashinakaburi Hirakata City, 573 / JP | 03 /
Matsuda, Hiromu 2-1-11-L209, Matsuodai, Inagawa-cho Kawabe-gun, Hyogo Pref., 666-02 / JP | 04 /
Kakino, Manabu Gurobaru Uji-kohata 405, 31, Kitayamahata Kohata, Uji City, 611 / JP | 05 /
Ikoma, Munehisa 153, Iyodo, Tawaramoto-cho Shiki-gun, Nara Pref., 636-03 / JP | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104057.3 | 14.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | JP19950054801 | 14.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5480195 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732759 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732759 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/02 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
H01M50/258 (EP,US);
H01M10/342 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/224 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/233 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/264 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/38] | Title | German: | Batteriemodul aus gasdichten alkalischen Akkumulatoren | [1996/38] | English: | Module battery of sealed alkaline storage battery | [1996/38] | French: | Module de batterie d'accumulateurs étanches alcalins | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1267153 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES); | [A]US3846179 (SHAW F) [A] 8 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US4020244 (SELINKO GEORGE JOSEPH) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 15 - line 42; figure 1 * * column 2, line 63 - line 66 *; | [A]GB1537108 (CHLORIDE GROUP LTD); | [A]EP0065349 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 16 - page 11, line 17; figure 1 * * page 4, line 10 - line 31 *; | [PX]EP0669663 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3,4,6,9,10 * figures 1,4; claims 1,7,12 * * page 5, line 45 - page 6, line 5 * * page 13, line 39 - line 43 * |