EP0752680 - Optical scanners having dual surface optical elements for dual working ranges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US | ||
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 116 Wilbur Place Bohemia New York 11716 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dvorkis, Paul 39 Barker Drive Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 02 /
Barkan, Edward 3 Enchanted Woods Court Miller Place, NY 11764 / US | 03 /
Shepard, Howard 18 Provost Avenue Great Neck, NY 11739 / US | 04 /
Gurevich, Vladimir P.O. Box 184 Bohemia, NY 11716 / US | 05 /
Krichever, Mark 26 Carldon Lane Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | 06 /
Metlitsky, Boris 23 Acorn Lane Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 07 /
Tsi, David 1399 Stony Brook Road Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 08 /
Bridgelall, Raj 1 Flora Drive Mount Sinai, NY 11766 / US | 09 /
He, Duanfeng 50 Peconic Street, Apt. 132 B Ronkonkoma, NY 11779 / US | 10 /
Katz, Joseph 12 Hallock Meadow Drive Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 11 /
Isaac, Richard 8 Field Daisy Lane East Northport, NY 11731 / US | 12 /
Kahn, Joel 49 Shepherd Street Rockville Centre, NY 11590 / US | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/02] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104236.3 | 18.03.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | US19950405585 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: US 405585 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752680 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752680 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
G06K7/10801 (EP,US);
G06K7/10594 (EP,US);
G06K7/10623 (EP,US);
G06K7/10633 (EP,US);
G06K7/10792 (EP,US);
G06K7/10881 (EP,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/02] | Title | German: | Optische Abtasteinheit für zwei Reichweiten mit zweifachen optischen Oberflächenelementen | [1997/02] | English: | Optical scanners having dual surface optical elements for dual working ranges | [1997/02] | French: | Scanner optique avec des éléments optiques avec deux surfaces pour deux rayons d'action | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02003053.2 / EP1204068 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0539054 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7,9,10,11,15; | [A]US5149948 (CHISHOLM THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1,4,5,13,14; | [A]US5304788 (METLITSKY BORIS [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,13,14 |