EP0723869 - On-demand type ink jet print head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katakura, Takahiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 02 /
Kumagai, Toshio c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 03 /
Yasukawa, Shinji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 04 /
Sonehara, Hideaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 05 /
Matsuzawa, Masanao c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 06 /
Akahane, Fujio c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 07 /
Kurashima, Norihiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 08 /
Ohshima, Toshiaki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | 09 /
Iida, Katsuhiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagana / JP | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/31] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104347.8 | 15.06.1992 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | JP19910168880 | 13.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16888091 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723869 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723869 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0723869 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/19 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/14274 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/19 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14467 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/31] | Title | German: | Auf Anforderung arbeitender Tintenstrahldruckkopf | [1996/31] | English: | On-demand type ink jet print head | [1996/31] | French: | Tête d'impression à jet d'encre du type à la demande | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92110077.2 / EP0518380 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 10.04.2002 | IT | 10.04.2002 | LI | 10.04.2002 | NL | 10.04.2002 | SE | 10.07.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/16] | CH | 10.04.2002 | |
LI | 10.04.2002 | ||
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.04.2002 | |
SE | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 10.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63303751 ; | [DA]EP0083877 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [DA] 1-13 * column W *; | [A]EP0408978 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column W * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890406), vol. 13, no. 140, Database accession no. (M - 180), & JP63303751 A 19881212 (NEC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |