EP0735061 - Use of aqueous cationically stabilized polymer dispersions as binder for moulded articles based on small particles having a negative surface charge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reck, Bernd, Dr. Beim Bergtor 14 67269 Grünstadt / DE | 02 /
Beckerle, Wilhelm Friedrich Beethovenstr. 20 1/2 67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 03 /
Portugall, Michael, Dr. Cuiserystr. 4 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 04 /
Wistuba, Eckehart, Dr. Im Obergarten 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 05 /
Meister, Martin, Dr. Lincolnstr. 19 67434 Neustadt / DE | [1996/40] | Application number, filing date | 96104380.9 | 20.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | DE1995111130 | 27.03.1995 Original published format: DE 19511130 | [1996/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735061 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735061 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F212/08, C08F220/12, C09J125/14, C09J133/06, C04B26/04, C04B26/06, C08K5/17 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
C04B26/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/12 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2103/0045 (EP,KR,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B26/06, C04B14/18, C04B14/38, C04B18/24, C04B2103/408 (US,EP);
C04B26/06, C04B14/18, C04B14/38, C04B18/24, C04B24/121 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | Verwendung kationisch stabilisierter wässriger Polymerisatdispersionen als Bindemittel für Formkörper auf der Basis von einer negativen Oberflächenladung aufweisenden feinteiligen Materialien | [1996/40] | English: | Use of aqueous cationically stabilized polymer dispersions as binder for moulded articles based on small particles having a negative surface charge | [1996/40] | French: | Utilisation de dispersions aqueuses de polymère, stabilisées cationiquement en tant que liants pour articles moulés, à base de fine particules ayant une charge de surface négative | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0266850 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1,8,14* claim -; table I *; | [DA]EP0475166 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8,14 * claim - *; | [A]EP0486374 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [A] 8 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0497100 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,14 * column 4, line 27 - line 38; examples 5,8,VB1,VB6,; claim - * |