EP0737425 - Oil-in-water emulsion containing lysophospholipo-proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okutomi, Yasuo c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo KK, 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shimada, Toshihiro c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo KK, 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104526.7 | 21.03.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | JP19950089889 | 14.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8988995 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737425 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737425 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/19, A23D7/00 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
A23D7/0053 (EP,US);
A23L9/22 (EP,US);
A23L9/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | Öl-in-Wasser Emulsionen, welche Lysophospholipoproteine enthalten | [1996/42] | English: | Oil-in-water emulsion containing lysophospholipo-proteins | [1996/42] | French: | Emulsions de l'huile-dans-l'eau contenant des lysophospholipoprotéines | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.09.2001 | SE | 12.12.2001 | [2004/16] |
Former [2002/15] | FI | 12.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4119564 (VAN DAM ANTONIUS FRANCISCUS) [X] 1,2 * examples I-V *; | [E]EP0716811 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [E] 1,2 * examples 1-3 *; | [XY]EP0426211 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 4 - line 48; example VII * * page 1, line 15 - line 23 * [Y] 1-14; | [X]EP0166284 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [X] 1,2 * examples 1,2 *; | [XY] - C.E.DUTILH AND W.GROGER, "Improvement of Product Attributes of Mayonnaise by enzymatic Hydrolysis of Egg Yolk with Phospholipase A2", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (1981), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 451 - 458, XP000575852 [X] 1,2 * chapter 2.2 *; page 457, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-14 | [Y] - K.E.THOME AND G.ERIKSSON, "The foaming properties of cream", MILCHWISSENSCHAFT, (1973), vol. 28, no. 9, pages 554 - 558, XP000576340 [Y] 1-14 * page 557, column L * | by applicant | JPH0361408 |