EP0733693 - Method for providing a tube having coke formation and carbon monoxide inhibiting properties when used for the thermal cracking of hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Ronald E. 6419 Quail Ridge Rd Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 02 /
Harper, Timothy P. 4964 SE Brookline Drive Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 03 /
Reed, Larry E. P.O. Box 2461 Bartlesville, OK 74005-2461 / US | 04 /
Scharre, Mark D. 2809 Claremont Drive Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | 05 /
Greenwood, Gil J. 1429 S. Shawnee Bartlesville, OK 74003 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler, Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/39] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104603.4 | 22.03.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | US19950409292 | 23.03.1995 Original published format: US 409292 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0733693 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0733693 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733693 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10G9/16 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
C10G9/14 (EP,US);
F27B21/00 (KR);
C10G9/16 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US);
Y10S585/95 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Versorgung eines Rohres mit Koksanlagerung- und Kohlenmonoxidhemmenden Eigenschaften bei dem thermische Kracken von Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1996/39] | English: | Method for providing a tube having coke formation and carbon monoxide inhibiting properties when used for the thermal cracking of hydrocarbons | [1996/39] | French: | Méthode pour fournir un tube ayant des propriétés d'inhibiteur de formation de coke et de monoxyde de carbone lorsqu'utilisé dans le craguage d'hydrocarbures | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00119326.7 / EP1054050 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0540084 (DONEGANI GUIDO IST [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * claims 1,10,12,14-17,19 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]US5284994 (BROWN RONALD E [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 4, line 39; claim 1 *; | [PX]DE4405884 (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2,5,6* claims 1-12 * | Examination | EP0241020 | WO9215653 | WO9522588 |