EP0733578 - Device for emergency operation of an elevator motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Munkkiniemen Puistotie 25 00330 Helsinki / FI | [1998/35] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states KONE OY Munkkiniemen Puistotie 25 00330 Helsinki 33 / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aulanko, Esko Käenkatu 6 C 33 04230 Kerava / FI | 02 /
Hakala, Harri Päivälänkatu 15 A 2 05830 Hyvinkää / FI | 03 /
Mustalahti, Jorma Raivaajantie 13 05620 Hyvinkää / FI | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Wahl, Hendrik, et al Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Wahl, Hendrik, Dr.-Ing., et al Zipse & Habersack, Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/39] | Wahl, Hendrik Zipse & Habersack & Wahl, Kemnatenstrasse 49 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104741.2 | 25.03.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | FI19950001428 | 24.03.1995 Original published format: FI 951428 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0733578 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0733578 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733578 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/02 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
B66B5/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/39] | Title | German: | Notbetriebsvorrichtung für Aufzugsmotor | [1996/39] | English: | Device for emergency operation of an elevator motor | [1996/39] | French: | Dispositif de manoeuvre de secours d'un moteur d'ascenseur | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US4376471 (UCHINO HIDEO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-4,7 * column 4, line 46 - line 55 * * figures 2,4,6 * [Y] 5; | [YA]JPH01313283 ; | [A]EP0248754 (ORTIGOSA GARCIA JUAN) [A] 1-3,7 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 53 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4024455 (YARROW CHRISTOPHER JOHN, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]CN1083017 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900302), vol. 014, no. 113, Database accession no. (M - 0944), & JP01313283 A 19891218 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 1 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 24, Database accession no. 95-179505, XP002039050 & CN1083017 A 19940302 (XINKAI GEN PILOT FACTORY XICHENG DISTRIC) [A] 6 * abstract * |