EP0740274 - Road/vehicle communication method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Hironao c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96104899.8 | 27.03.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19950106754 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: JP 10675495 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740274 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740274 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740274 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/00 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
H04B7/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kommunikation Strasse/Fahrzeug | [1996/44] | English: | Road/vehicle communication method and device | [1996/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de communication route/véhicule | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 03.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH06243316 ; | EP0616302 [ ] (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * column 13, line 48 - column 17, line 4 *; | [A]EP0632420 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 45 * * column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 12 * * column 25, line 56 - column 35, line 2 *; | [A]EP0401192 (BAETS THIERRY DE [BE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * page 15, line 47 - page 16, line 38 *; | [A]EP0577027 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 53 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941130), vol. 018, no. 631, Database accession no. (P - 1836), & JP06243316 A 19940902 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [AD] 1-3,7,9,11-13 * abstract * |