EP0736384 - Device for starting and stopping printing and method for controlling such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/41] | Device for starting and stopping printing | ||
[1998/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mülheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hummel, Peter Schlesierstrasse 13 63069 Offenbach / DE | 02 /
Ortner, Robert Siedlung am Stein 26 63755 Alzenau / DE | 03 /
Schild, Helmut Im Wingertsgrund 148 61449 Steinbach, Taunus / DE | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Marek, Joachim c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Marek, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105039.0 | 29.03.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | DE1995113378 | 08.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19513378 | [1996/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736384 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736384 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/08, B41F13/28 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B41F33/08 (EP,US);
B41F13/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/41] | B41F33/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Druckan- und -abstellung und Verfahren zum Steuern dieser Vorrichtung | [1998/39] | English: | Device for starting and stopping printing and method for controlling such device | [1998/39] | French: | Dispositif pour enclencher ou déclencher l'impression et procédé de contrôle de ce dispositif | [1998/39] |
Former [1996/41] | Vorrichtung zur Druckan- und -abstellung | ||
Former [1996/41] | Device for starting and stopping printing | ||
Former [1996/41] | Dispositif pour enclencher ou déclencher l'impression | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4013075 (M.A.N.-ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT); | [A]EP0453845 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) |