EP0741030 - Method for controlling or regulating the inking during a printing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Werner, Dr. Dambach-la-ville-Str. 2d 69231 Rauenberg / DE | 02 /
Kistler, Bernd Kaltenbergstr. 46 75031 Eppingen / DE | 03 /
Geissler, Wolfgang Gartenstr. 34a 76669 Bad Schönborn / DE | 04 /
Bucher, Harald Finkenweg 5 74927 Eschelbronn / DE | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [1996/45] | Application number, filing date | 96105191.9 | 01.04.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | DE1995116353 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516353 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0741030 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0741030 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
B41F33/0045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern oder Regeln der Farbgebung während eines Druckprozesses | [1996/45] | English: | Method for controlling or regulating the inking during a printing process | [1996/45] | French: | Méthode pour contrôler ou régler l'encrage pendant une opération d'impression | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 06.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0196431 (BRUNNER) [DA] 1 * column A; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3226144 (VEB KOMBINAT POLYGRAPH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0411869 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) [A] 1 * column A; claim 11 *; | [A]US5029527 (JESCHKE ET AL.) [A] 1 * column A; claims 1,3 * |