blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0738547

EP0738547 - Steckel mill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMS Demag AG
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/21]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krämer, Stefan
Jakobstrasse 5
57271 Hilchenbach / DE
02 / Rosenthal, Dieter
Bergstrasse 22A
57572 Niederfischbach / DE
03 / Sudau, Peter
Hüttenweg 5
57271 Hilchenbach / DE
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Valentin, Ekkehard, et al
Patentanwälte
Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse
Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Former [1996/43]Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date96105299.003.04.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateDE199511447519.04.1995         Original published format: DE 19514475
[1996/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738547
Date:23.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738547
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:B21B1/34, B21B37/74, B21B45/00
[1996/43]
CPC:
B21B1/34 (EP,US); B21B1/26 (KR); B21B37/74 (EP,US);
B21B45/004 (EP,US); B21B2273/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/43]
TitleGerman:Steckel-Walzwerk[1996/43]
English:Steckel mill[1996/43]
French:Laminoir steckel[1996/43]
Examination procedure19.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
16.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.1999Fee for grant paid
22.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.05.199803   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.1998
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS59191502  ;
 [Y]SU728955  ;
 [XA]JPH04172104  ;
 [PA]JPH07241602  ;
 [A]JPS60216910  ;
 [A]US4455848  (TIPPINS GEORGE W [US], et al);
 [A]US4938049  (MASUDA SADAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 2 - column 3; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5195344  (MASUDA SADAKAZU [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 2 - column 3; figure 1 *;
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850313), vol. 009, no. 057, Database accession no. (M - 363), & JP59191502 A 19841030 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [Y] 7,8
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 49, Database accession no. 80-87823C, XP002011470 & SU728955 A 19800430 (FILATOV A S) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921002), vol. 016, no. 474, Database accession no. (M - 1319), & JP04172104 A 19920619 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 5
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 009, & JP07241602 A 19950919 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [PA] 1,3-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860322), vol. 010, no. 073, Database accession no. (M - 463), & JP60216910 A 19851030 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.