Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0736343 | Global Dossier | 16.10.1996 | A3 | EP0736343 | 09.10.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITLI950003 | 06.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT239998Y | 16.03.2001 | Y1 | ITLI950003U | 06.10.1996 | U1 | ITLI950003V0 | 06.04.1995 | V0 | Priority number | Date | ITLI950003 | 06.04.1995 |