EP0737680 - (Phenylalkylaminoalkyloxyl)-hetero-aryl compounds, processes and intermediates for their preparation and medicaments containing these compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [1997/24] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states Kali-Chemie Pharma GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mlinaric, Michael, Dr. Kollenrodtstrasse 57 30163 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Kehrbach, Wolfgang, Dr. Altenbekener Damm 41 30173 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Ziegler, Dieter, Dr. Müggenwinkel 44 30966 Hemmingen / DE | 04 /
Brückner, Reinhard, Dr. Homburgweg 8 30559 Hannover / DE | 05 /
Bielenberg, Willi, Dr. Holzerstrasse 16 a 31061 Alfeld/Leine / DE | 06 /
Rose, Horst, Dr. Hildewoldstr. 32 30455 Hannover / DE | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Gosmann, Martin, et al Abbott Products GmbH IP Department (PH-ZP) Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Gosmann, Martin, Dr., et al Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung Postfach 220 30002 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1996/42] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharma Deutschland GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105335.2 | 03.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | DE1995113503 | 10.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19513503 | [1996/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737680 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737680 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D261/12, C07D271/06, C07D285/08, C07D413/04, C07D417/04, A61K31/41, A61K31/42 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C07D271/07 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D231/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | (Phenylalkylaminoalkyloxy)-hetero-aryl-Verbindungen sowie Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte zu ihrer Herstellung und diese Verbindungen enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1996/42] | English: | (Phenylalkylaminoalkyloxyl)-hetero-aryl compounds, processes and intermediates for their preparation and medicaments containing these compounds | [1996/42] | French: | Composés de (phénylalkylaminoalkyloxy)-hétéro-aryle, procédés et produits intermédiaires pour leur préparation et médicaments contenant ces composés | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.03.2004 | IE | 03.03.2004 | AT | 03.04.2004 | LU | 03.04.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/51] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
AT | 03.04.2004 | ||
LU | 03.04.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
LU | 03.04.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0170861 (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,10* claims 1,14 *; | [X]EP0335723 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,10 * Seite 6, Formel (Id); Seite 9, Formel (I-3); Seite 18, Verbindung Nr. 3-75 *;; claims 1,29,37 *; | [X]EP0405905 (SANKYO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,10 * Seite 5, Formel (Ib); Seite 9, Verbindung Nr. 33 *;; claim 1 * |