EP0736954 - Device for elastically supporting an electric motor inside a housing, particularly for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [1996/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boucheret, Bernard 42 Bd. J.J. Rousseau 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 96105336.0 | 03.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | FR19950003893 | 03.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9503893 | [1996/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736954 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736954 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/24, F04D29/66, F16F1/376 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
H02K5/24 (EP,US);
F04D29/668 (EP,US);
F16F1/376 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur elastischen Befestigung eines Elektromotors in einem Gehäuse, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1998/20] | English: | Device for elastically supporting an electric motor inside a housing, particularly for motor vehicles | [1996/41] | French: | Dispositif de fixation élastique d'un moteur électrique à l'intérieur d'un boîtier, notamment pour véhicule automobile | [1996/41] |
Former [1996/41] | Vorrichtung zur elastischen Befestigung eines Elektromotors ein einem Gehäuse, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | Examination procedure | 12.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB433850 (BAUMGARTEN G M B H) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4306588 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 4; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE4136485 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 32 - line 48; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0072465 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,7 * figure -; claim 1 * |