EP0736789 - Catadioptric optical system and exposure apparatus having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Tomowaki, c/o Nikon Corp. Int. Prop. H.Q., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105452.5 | 04.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | JP19950082380 | 07.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8238095 | JP19960030978 | 19.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3097896 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736789 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736789 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736789 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/08, G03F7/20, G03B27/32 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
G02B17/0892 (EP,US);
G02B17/0856 (KR);
G02B17/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/70225 (EP,US);
G03F7/70275 (EP,US);
G03F7/70358 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | Catadioptrisches System und dieses verwendender Belichtungsapparat | [1996/41] | English: | Catadioptric optical system and exposure apparatus having the same | [1996/41] | French: | Système catadioptrique et appareil d'exposition lumineuse utilisante ce système | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2003
12.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss 73446 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Prins, Adrianus Willem V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2003
Carl Zeiss 73446 Oberkochen / DE Opponent's representative Prins, Adrianus Willem Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | 19.02.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.03.2004 | Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | 27.08.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.09.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.05.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.05.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5323263 (SCHOENMAKERS WIJNAND P [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6,11,18,19,21,22,26; | [A]EP0604093 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,11,13,18,19,22,26,28; | [A]US5289312 (HASHIMOTO SUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,9,18,19,21,24; | [A]US5402267 (FUERTER GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,18 |