EP0736257 - Method and system for connecting molds on continuously operating molding lines, particularly for manufacturing confectionery products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOREMARTEC S.A. Drève de l'Arc-en-Ciel 102 6700 Arlon-Schoppach / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states SOREMARTEC S.A. Drève de l'Arc en Ciel 102 6700 Arlon-Schoppach / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sobrero, Giovanni Via Cavallotti, 2 12050 Cerretto Langhe / IT | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Boggio, Luigi STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96105490.5 | 04.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00268 | 07.04.1995 Original published format: IT TO950268 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736257 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736257 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/02, A23G7/00 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
A23G3/0263 (EP);
A23G3/0268 (EP);
A23G3/0278 (EP);
A23G7/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/41] | Extension states | SI | 30.04.1996 | Title | German: | Verbindungssystem und -verfahren für Giessformen von Durchlaufformmaschine, insbesondere für Konfektformen | [1996/41] | English: | Method and system for connecting molds on continuously operating molding lines, particularly for manufacturing confectionery products | [1996/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de connection de moules sur une chaîne de moulage continue, en particulier pour confiserie | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 28.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2000 | CH | 12.07.2000 | ES | 12.07.2000 | FI | 12.07.2000 | GR | 12.07.2000 | LI | 12.07.2000 | NL | 12.07.2000 | DK | 12.10.2000 | PT | 12.10.2000 | SE | 12.10.2000 | GB | 04.04.2001 | IE | 04.04.2001 | LU | 04.04.2001 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
GR | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
NL | 12.07.2000 | ||
DK | 12.10.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
IE | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
NL | 12.07.2000 | ||
DK | 12.10.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
IE | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
NL | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
IE | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
IE | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
ES | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
GB | 04.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
CH | 12.07.2000 | ||
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
LI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
FI | 12.07.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 12.07.2000 | |
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 12.07.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0662719 ; | [A]DE415990 (AUGUST BECK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB752478 (KAI CHRISTIAN SOPHUS AASTED); | [A]GB1109099 (PETER RABBIT CANDIES INC); | [A]FR2130689 (MASCH HENNECKE GMBH) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB1405861 (BAKER PERKINS HOLDINGS LTD) [X] 1,3,10-12,20-23,26 * page 2, line 125 - page 3, line 35 * [Y] 9,24,25; | [Y]DE2536727 (FERRERO GMBH) [Y] 9,24,25 * page 6; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3005838 (CARLE & MONTANARI SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * figure 1, details 38,40,and 41; figure 6; page 20 *; | [A]DE4128905 (APV CORP LTD [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940606), vol. 18, no. 296, Database accession no. (C - 1209), & JP0662719 A 19940308 (AISAN SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1 * abstract * |