Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] |
29.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
03.06.1999 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
29.04.1998 | Renewal fee | |
24.01.1997 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
15.11.1996 | Publication of search report | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] |
15.11.1996 | Change - classification | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] |
23.08.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |