EP0736360 - Trigger device for box nailing machine and box nailing machine having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osuka, Satoshi c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Noboru c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Adachi, Michiaki c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hamano, Terufumi c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kimura, Youichi c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Hanagasaki, Hiroshi c/o Max Co., Ltd., 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105493.9 | 04.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | JP19950080614 | 05.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8061495 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0736360 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0736360 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/04, B25C1/00 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B25C1/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/41] | B25C1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/41] | Title | German: | Auslösevorrichtung für eine Nagelmachine für Kästen und damit ausgerüstete Nagelmaschine für Kästen | [1996/41] | English: | Trigger device for box nailing machine and box nailing machine having the same | [1996/41] | French: | Dispositif de déclenchement pour une machine à clouer des boîtes et machine à clouer des boîtes équipée avec ce dispositif | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 02.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/17] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4679719 (KRAMER FRANCIS J [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 12, lines 29-33 * [A] 2,4; | [A]US4405071 (AUSTIN RONALD [US]) [A] 2,4 * column A; figures 1-7 * |