EP0737975 - Recording medium, recording apparatus and recording method for recording data into recording medium, and reproducing apparatus and reproducing method for reproducing data from recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Shinichi, c/o Int. Prop Div. K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Taira, Kazuhiko, c/o Int. Prop Div. K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Kurano, Tomoaki, c/o Int. Prop Div. K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Mimura, Hideki, c/o Int. Prop Div. K.K. Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105655.3 | 10.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | JP19950085693 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8569395 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737975 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737975 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737975 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/28 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
G11B7/00 (KR);
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G11B20/1252 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/30 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G06F2003/0697 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
H04N9/8216 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/42] | G11B20/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungdmedium, -gerät und -methode zur Aufzeichnung von Daten auf einem Aufzeichnungsmedium, und Wiedergabegerät und -methode zur Wiedergabe von Daten von einem Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1996/42] | English: | Recording medium, recording apparatus and recording method for recording data into recording medium, and reproducing apparatus and reproducing method for reproducing data from recording medium | [1996/42] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement et méthode, appareil d'enregistrement d'enregistrement pour enregistrer les données sur le milieu d'enregistrement, et appareil de reproduction et méthode de reproduction pour la reproduction de données du milieu d'enregistrement | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 04.06.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.1999 | BE | 07.07.1999 | CH | 07.07.1999 | ES | 07.07.1999 | IT | 07.07.1999 | LI | 07.07.1999 | NL | 07.07.1999 | SE | 07.07.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
ES | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
NL | 07.07.1999 | ||
SE | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
ES | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
SE | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
SE | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 07.07.1999 | ||
LI | 07.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | ||
CH | 12.10.1999 | ||
LI | 12.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 07.07.1999 | |
BE | 07.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9407332 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,6,11,14,17,20,23,26 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 4 * [A] 2-5,7-10,12,13,15,16,18,19,21,22,24,25,27,28; | [PYA]EP0685845 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [PY] 1,6,11,14,17,20,23,26 * column 6, line 46 - column 11, line 32 *[PA] 2-5,7-10,12,13,15,16,18,19,21,22,24,25,27,28 |