EP0738686 - Photocatalytic waste-water purification with the use of multi-layered cross-braced plates as solar elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/43] | Reactors for photocatalytic waste-water purification with the use of multi-layered cross-braced plates as solar elements | ||
[1999/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH & Co. KG Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2001/22] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benz, Volker, Dr. Am Dachsrain 13 64739 Höchst / DE | 02 /
Müller, Michael, Dr. Pater-Delp-Strasse 32 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Bahnemann, Detlef, Dr. Am kahlen Berg 9 30826 Garbsen / DE | 04 /
Weichgrebe, Dirk, Dr.-Ing. Gottlieb-Genzmer-Str. 22 17094 Burg Stargard / DE | 05 /
Brehm, Manfred, Dr. Am Hollerbach 16 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [1996/43] | Application number, filing date | 96105703.1 | 11.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | DE1995114372 | 18.04.1995 Original published format: DE 19514372 | [1996/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738686 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738686 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP);
C02F1/725 (EP);
Y02W10/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | Photokatalytische Abwasserreinigung mit Stegmehrfachplatten als Solarelemente | [2000/26] | English: | Photocatalytic waste-water purification with the use of multi-layered cross-braced plates as solar elements | [1999/36] | French: | Traitement des eaux usées utilisant des plaques multicouches entretoisées comme des panneaux solaires | [1999/36] |
Former [1996/43] | Reaktoren für die photokatalytische Abwasserreinigung mit Stegmehrfachplatten als Solarelementen | ||
Former [1996/43] | Reactors for photocatalytic waste-water purification with the use of multi-layered cross-braced plates as solar elements | ||
Former [1996/43] | Réacteurs pour le traitement des eaux usées utilisant des plaques multicouches entretoisées comme des panneaux solaires | Examination procedure | 04.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06343875 ; | [A]JPH0549861 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 94, no. 012, & JP06343875 A 19941220 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 10, Database accession no. 95-069444 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930706), vol. 017, no. 355, Database accession no. (C - 1079), & JP05049861 A 19930302 (MITSUI ENG & SHIPBUILD CO LTD) [A] 1 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 14, Database accession no. 93-112031 [ ] * abstract * |