EP0737945 - Method for generating a mailpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | ||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. World Headquarters One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Sung S. 84 White Birch Lane Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US | 02 /
Harman, James L. 710 Mill Hill Road Southport, Connecticut 06490 / US | 03 /
Jacobson, Gary S. 2 Pine Hill Avenue East Norwalk, Connencticut 06855 / US | 04 /
Kirschner, Wesley A. 262 Beacon Hill Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 05 /
Ramadei, Michael J. 248 White Plains Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 06 /
Zuidema, Eric L. 4 Kendall Court Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | [1997/01] |
Former [1996/42] | 01 /
Chang, Sung S. 84 White Birch Lane Stamford, Connecticut 06905 / US | ||
02 /
Harman, James L. 710 Mill Hill Road Southport, Connecticut 06490 / US | |||
03 /
Jacobson, Gary S. 2 Pine Hill Avenue East Norwalk, Connencticut 06855 / US | |||
04 /
Kirschner, Wesley A. 262 Beacon Hill Road Trumbull Road, Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
05 /
Ramadei, Michael J. 248 White Plains Road Trumbull Road, Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
06 /
Zuidema, Eric L. 4 Kendall Court Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | Representative(s) | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Avery, Stephen John, et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105791.6 | 12.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | US19950421120 | 13.04.1995 Original published format: US 421120 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737945 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737945 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737945 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
B07C1/00 (EP,US);
G07B17/00314 (EP,US);
G07B17/00362 (EP,US);
G07B17/00661 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00322 (EP,US);
G07B2017/0033 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00419 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00427 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00491 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00677 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen eines Poststückes | [1996/42] | English: | Method for generating a mailpiece | [1996/42] | French: | Procédé de création d'un pli postal | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0618016 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - line 49 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 50 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 29 * * column 7, line 16 - line 39 * * claim 10 * * figure 1 * [A] 6,10,17; | [A]EP0376743 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 22 - line 50 * * column 3, line 32 - line 38 * * column 5, line 30 - line 53 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 6 * * column 11, line 25 - column 13, line 11 * * claims 1-3,7,9-11 *; | [A]EP0372726 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-4,13 * page 2, line 40 - line 54 * * page 5, line 6 - line 27 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4497040 (GOMES JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1,4,13 * column 3, line 3 - line 27 * * claims 1-8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5264665 (DELFER III FRANK W [US]) [A] 1,4,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - line 62 * * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 15 * * claims 1,7 * * figures 1A,2 *; | [A]US5058030 (SCHUMACHER KARL H [US]) [A] 1,4,13 * abstract * * column 4, line 3 - line 27 * * column 9, line 2 - line 58 * * figures 1,4 * |