EP0741283 - Ultrasonic sensor to determine flow rate of a flowing liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landis+Gyr GmbH Humboldstrasse 59 90495 Nürnberg / DE | [2003/19] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states Landis & Gyr Technology Innovation AG 6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adam, Norbert Julius-Leber-Strasse 6 63450 Hanau / DE | 02 /
Steghaus, Michael Bonamesermittelgasse 2a 60437 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Schupp, Horst Bessunger Strasse 42 64347 Griesheim / DE | 04 /
Hauenstein, Günther Luisantring 92 63477 Maintal / DE | [2003/18] |
Former [1996/45] | 01 /
Adam, Norbert Julius-Leber-Strasse 6 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
02 /
Stegheus, Michael Offenbacher Landstrasse 497A 60599 Frankfurt / DE | |||
03 /
Schupp, Horst Bessunger Strasse 42 64347 Griesheim / DE | |||
04 /
Hauenstein, Günther Luisantring 92 63477 Maintal / DE | Representative(s) | OK pat AG Industriestrasse 47 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 96105823.7 | 13.04.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | EP19950810286 | 03.05.1995 Original published format: EP 95810286 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741283 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FI, LI, SE [1996/45] | Extension states | LT | 13.04.1996 | Title | German: | Ultraschall-Messwertgeber zur Bestimmung der Durchflussmenge einer strömenden Flüssigkeit | [1996/45] | English: | Ultrasonic sensor to determine flow rate of a flowing liquid | [1996/45] | French: | Capteur à ultrason pour la détermination du débit d'un liquide en écoulement | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]US4140012 (HENDRIKS HENRY L) [DY] 1,4 * column 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 5; | [Y]DE3239770 (DANFOSS AS) [Y] 1,4 * page 10 - page 11; figures 1-7 *; | [A]JPS6076620 ; | [A]EP0622614 (NUOVOPIGNONE INDUSTRIE MECCANICHE E FONDERIA S.P.A.) [A] 5 * abstract * * column 7, line 44 - line 49; figures 2,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850904), vol. 009, no. 217, Database accession no. (P - 385)<1940> , & JP60076620 A 00000000 (NITSUSHIN SEIKOU KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |