EP0800938 - Damping element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOWAG Motorwagenfabrik AG Unterseestrasse 65 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [1997/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greuter, Adolf Oberstrasse 23a 8274 Trägerwillen / DE | 02 /
Doll, Bernhard Postweg 69 8573 Siegerhausen / DE | 03 /
Lorini, Romano Burgauerstrasse 34 9230 Flawil / DE | 04 /
Schöder, Jens Kreuzlingerstrasse 36 78462 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
Osterwalder, Franz Weiherstrasse 602 8280 Kreuzlingen / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patentanwälte Postfach 70 08 60 81308 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem., et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patentanwälte, Postfach 70 08 60 81308 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96105967.2 | 16.04.1996 | [1997/42] | Priority number, date | DE1996109654 | 12.03.1996 Original published format: DE 19609654 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0800938 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0800938 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60G15/12, F16F9/342 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
F16F9/342 (EP);
F16F9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | Dämpfungselement | [1997/42] | English: | Damping element | [1997/42] | French: | Elément d'amortissement | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4452437 (LOCHNER KASPAR) [X] 1-4,8,10,12,14 * column 8, line 44 - line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]FR2695698 (RICARD ANDRE) [X] 1-4,10,12,13,15 * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 4; figure 4 * [A] 5; | [XA]FR2174980 (ITT) [X] 1,2,8,9,12,14 * figures 1,4,5 * [A] 3-6,10; | [A]US2865396 (FOCHT) [A] 5,6 * column 3, line 36 - line 55; figures 3-6 *; | [A]US3031181 (SCHNITZER) [A] 1,5,6,10,12,15 * column 2, line 35 - line 41; figure . *; | [A]US4064977 (TAYLOR DOUGLAS P); | [A]US3820772 (KERR L ET AL); | [A]US4558767 (TAYLOR DOUGLAS P) |