EP0742999 - Shelter for animals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gloning, Isidor Hauptstrasse 5 73485 Zöbingen / DE | For all designated states Bauer, Otto Hesslachshof 12 74677 Dörzbach / DE | [1996/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106209.8 | 19.04.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | DE19951017788 | 15.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19517788 | DE19951019185 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519185 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742999 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742999 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/02, A01K1/00 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
A01K1/00 (EP);
A01K1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, NL [1996/47] | Title | German: | Tierschutzhütte | [1996/47] | English: | Shelter for animals | [1996/47] | French: | Refuge pour animaux | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.07.1998 | FR | 01.07.1998 | NL | 01.07.1998 | DK | 01.10.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/46] | ES | 01.07.1998 | |
NL | 01.07.1998 | ||
DK | 01.10.1998 | ||
FR | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 01.07.1998 | |
NL | 01.07.1998 | ||
FR | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 01.07.1998 | |
FR | 27.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 27.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0504076 (GIBELIN JEAN MARIE [FR]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0338580 (BUGL HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, lines 50-54; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]DE3813471 (BUGL HELMUT [DE], et al); | [A]WO8602433 (KNOCK CHRISTOPHER ALAN [GB]) |