EP0741190 - Cooling plates for shaft furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states MAN Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofstrasse 66 46145 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hille, Hartmut, Ing. Dürerstrasse 142 47447 Moers-Schwafheim / DE | 02 /
Otremba, Werner, Ing. Elsternstrasse 32 46145 Oberhausen / DE | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106335.1 | 23.04.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | DE1995116535 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516535 | DE1995145048 | 02.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19545048 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741190 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741190 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/10 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
C21B7/10 (EP,US);
F27B1/24 (EP,US);
F27D1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | Kühlplatten für Schachtöfen | [1996/45] | English: | Cooling plates for shaft furnaces | [1996/45] | French: | Plaques de refroidissement pour fours à cuve | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU323447 ; | [A]JPS59226106 ; | [A]JPH04259315 ; | [AD]DE2907511 (KABEL- UND METALLWERKE GUTEHOFFNUNGSHÜTTE ET AL.) [AD] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0411336 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - line 50 *; | [A]EP0430740 (CHAVANNE KETIN [FR]) [A] 1* figures 5,6 *; | [ADP]EP0705906 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [ADP] 1 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 72-58584T, XP002011296 & SU323447 A 00000000 (SIBERIAN METALLURGICAL WO) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850425), vol. 009, no. 096, Database accession no. (C - 278)<1819>, & JP59226106 A 19841219 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930126), vol. 017, no. 042, Database accession no. (C - 1020), & JP04259315 A 19920914 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |