EP0740339 - Method of forming a capacitor electrode of a semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Toshiyuki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Shuji, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106454.0 | 24.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19950103760 | 27.04.1995 Original published format: JP 10376095 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740339 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740339 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740339 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L21/3205, H01L27/108 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
H10B12/318 (EP,US);
H10B12/033 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | H01L21/8242, H01L21/108, H01L21/3205 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Kondensatorelektrode einer Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [1996/44] | English: | Method of forming a capacitor electrode of a semiconductor memory device | [1996/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une électrode de condensateur pour un dispositif de mémoire semi-conductrice | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 27.06.2003 | [2004/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH0629463 ; | [Y]JPS5539634 ; | [A]JPS58204540 ; | [A]JPS6130046 |