EP0740455 - Data communication apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosaka, Masahiko, c/oCanon K.K 30-2, Shimomaruko 3 chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/44] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106464.9 | 24.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19950099313 | 25.04.1995 Original published format: JP 9931395 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740455 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740455 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740455 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04N1/32106 (EP,US);
H04N1/32112 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3202 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3219 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/44] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungsvorrichtung und -verfahren | [1996/44] | English: | Data communication apparatus and method | [1996/44] | French: | Appareil et procédé de communication de données | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.07.2003 | ES | 13.10.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/46] | ES | 13.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0372877 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,10,12 * column A *; | [A]US5101427 (KOTANI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,10,12 * column A *; | [A]US5283665 (OGATA YUKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,5,10,12* column A *; | [A] - "METHOD FOR FACSIMILE DISTRIBUTION ON A LOCAL AREA NETWORK", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH, GB, (19911201), no. 332, page 920, XP000274627 [A] 1,5,10,12 * the whole document * |