EP0741503 - Method of operation of a high-pressure gas-discharge lamp and circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA PLUS ELECTRONIC GMBH u. CO. KG. Lauterstrasse 29-31 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [1996/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heering, Wolfgang, Prof.Dr. Herzogenhornweg 5 D-76297 STUTENSEE / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Geibelstr. 9 D-76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106498.7 | 25.04.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | DE1995116052 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516052 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741503 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741503 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/00 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
H05B41/2858 (EP,US);
H05B41/42 (EP,US);
Y10S315/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Hochdruckgasentladungslampe und Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1996/45] | English: | Method of operation of a high-pressure gas-discharge lamp and circuit | [1996/45] | French: | Procédé et circuit d'opération des lampes à décharge à haute pression | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0092654 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * column W *; | [X]EP0082253 (CEAG LICHT & STROM [DE]) [X] 1-18 * column W *; | [X]US4560908 (STUPP EDWARD H [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column W * |