EP0740114 - Radiation type air conditioning system having dew-condensation preventing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1996/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukaiyama, Hiroshi Room No 201 Park-view-Heights, 3-8-13, Shironouchi Oizumi-machi, Ora-gun, Gunma / JP | 02 /
Cho, Masayuki Room No. 6-203, Izumi-Dormitory, 57-1, Sumiyoshi Oizumi-machi, Ora-gun, Gunma / JP | 03 /
Rakuma, Tsuyoshi 555, Kokai, Oizumi-machi Ora-gun, Gunma / JP | 04 /
Takada, Hiroyuki 42-24, Hon-cho Ota-shi, Gunma / JP | 05 /
Kato, Syozo 515-46 Higashibessho-cho Ota-shi, Gunma / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106564.6 | 25.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19950129299 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: JP 12929995 | JP19950214028 | 31.07.1995 Original published format: JP 21402895 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740114 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740114 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24F7/10, F24F13/068 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
F24F5/0092 (EP,US);
F24F1/00 (KR);
F24F13/22 (EP,US);
F24F7/10 (EP,US);
F24F11/41 (EP,US);
F24F2013/221 (EP,US);
F24F2221/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | F24F5/00 | Designated contracting states | GR, IT [1996/44] | Title | German: | Strahlungsklimaanlage mit Vorrichtung zum Verhindern der Taubildung | [1996/44] | English: | Radiation type air conditioning system having dew-condensation preventing mechanism | [1996/44] | French: | Système de climatisation à rayonnement avec mécanisme pour empêcher la formation de rosée | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/35] | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3292388 (ERNST SCHUCHARDT HORST) [X] 1-4,9,10,13,16 * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 58; figures 2,3 * [A] 5,11,12,14,17; | [A]EP0508176 (KESSLER & LUCH GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4407445 (VIVIAN CONSTANTINE [US]) |