EP0742355 - Gas turbine control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurzke, Joachim, Dr. Max Feldbauerweg 5 85221 Dachau / DE | [1996/46] | Application number, filing date | 96106809.5 | 30.04.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | DE1995116693 | 06.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19516693 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742355 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742355 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/28 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
F02C9/28 (EP);
F05D2270/112 (EP);
F05D2270/303 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung eines Turbo-Strahltriebwerkes | [1996/46] | English: | Gas turbine control method | [1996/46] | French: | Méthode de contrôle d'une turbine à gaz | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0427952 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 6, line 47 - page 7, line 38 * * page 9, line 14 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US3956883 (ANDERSON JOEL M, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - line 51 * * column 9, line 22 - column 11, line 45 * * column 11, line 32 - line 38 *; | [A]US3893291 (DAVIS JAMES L, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5267435 (FRENKEL RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 7 - column 23 * |