EP0749678 - Sowing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreyer, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Am Amazonenwerk 7 49205 Hasbergen / DE | 02 /
Scheufler, Bernd, Dr. Ing. Am Amazonenwerk 101 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96106891.3 | 02.05.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | DE19951022709 | 22.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19522709 | [1996/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749678 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749678 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0749678 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/20, A01B73/02 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
A01B73/02 (EP);
A01C7/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, SE [1996/52] | Title | German: | Sämaschine | [1996/52] | English: | Sowing machine | [1996/52] | French: | Semoir | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 08.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.11.1999
ADMISSIBLE Maasland N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | [2000/03] | 21.01.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.10.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.11.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.05.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.02.1999 | GB | 24.02.1999 | SE | 24.02.1999 | DK | 24.05.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/46] | GB | 24.02.1999 | |
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
DK | 24.05.1999 | ||
FR | 23.07.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 24.02.1999 | |
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
FR | 23.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | GB | 24.02.1999 | |
FR | 23.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 24.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4211288 (APPLEQUIST ROY E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 7, line 4 - line 22 * * column 8, line 38 - column 10, line 50; figures 1-6 * [Y] 5-7; | [YD]DE4326125 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [YD] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0114983 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * page 4, line 15 - page 7, column 33; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4172537 (GANDRUD DALE E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 25 - column 6, line 47; figures 1-10 * | Opposition | DE3900724 | EP0335455 | - PAREYS LANDWIRTSCHAFTSLEXIKON, 1956, SS 3 u. 318 |