EP0748912 - Window, door, or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUBI Baubeschläge GmbH Zum Grafenwald 54411 Hermeskeil / DE | [1996/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trampert, Johannes Kellerstrasse 9 54413 Gusenburg / DE | 02 /
Bohr, Norbert Zum Wadelborn 12a 54429 Schillingen / DE | 03 /
Eiden, Alfred Feldstrasse 28 54413 Gusenburg / DE | [1996/51] | Application number, filing date | 96107178.4 | 07.05.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | DE1995121601 | 14.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19521601 | [1996/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748912 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/18, E05C7/04 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
E05C9/1858 (EP);
E05C7/06 (EP);
E05C9/004 (EP);
E05C9/20 (EP);
E05C9/24 (EP);
E05B15/0245 (EP);
E05C9/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/51] | Title | German: | Fenster, Tür oder dergleichen | [1996/51] | English: | Window, door, or the like | [1996/51] | French: | Fenêtre, porte ou similaire | [1996/51] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 05.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 04.04.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE4218983 (SIEGENIA-FRANK KG) [DX] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0445432 (SIEGENIA-FRANK KG) [X] 1 * column 6, line 43 - line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2518624 (ETABLISSEMENTS JEAN MASSARD) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1185948 (WINERT) [A] 1-7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE850701 (ZIERLEYN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1350567 (ETABLISSEMENTS L. DEVILLEZ & CAMION, S.A.) [A] 1 |