EP0743039 - Vacuum cleaner body with a dust chamber lid for closing the dust chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [1997/04] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kess, Herbert Roebelstrasse 19 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Kessl, Josef, et al c/o Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GMBH Patent-und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Kessl, Josef, et al c/o Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GMBH Patent-und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96107199.0 | 07.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | DE1995118532 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19518532 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0743039 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0743039 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/14, A47L5/36 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
A47L9/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/47] | A47L9/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | Staubsaugergehäuse mit einem dessen Staubraum verschliessenden Staubraumdeckel | [1996/47] | English: | Vacuum cleaner body with a dust chamber lid for closing the dust chamber | [1996/47] | French: | Carter d'aspirateur comportant un clapet pour l'obturation de la chambre à poussière | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/43] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.02.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0607060 (BOSYJ NICK M ;BOWERS DONALD R (US); KOUKOURAKIS NICHOLAS (US); VIN) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 1-37; figure 12 *; | [A]US4055405 (THUN-HOHENSTEIN CARL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]US3821830 (SUNDHEIM J) [A] 1 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 31 * |